COMMISSION MEMBERS
Name | Position | Date of Original Appt | Current Term Expires |
Vacant |
District 4 representative
|
||
Steve Joiner |
District 3 representative | 6/28/2016 | 4/15/2025 |
Jim Connors |
District 2 representative Chairman |
10/25/2022 | 4/15/2025 |
Keith Marine |
District 1 representative
|
6/29/2021 | 4/15/2025 |
Ben Myhre |
District 5 representative | 5/15/2012 | 4/15/2025 |
Lee Morgan |
Public at-large representative | 6/20/2017 | 4/15/2024 |
Julie Sisneros |
Public at-large representative Secretary
|
8/27/2019 | 4/15/2024 |